Global Patent Index - EP 0879240 A4

EP 0879240 A4 2000-05-03 - HUMAN CRIPTIN GROWTH FACTOR

Title (en)

HUMAN CRIPTIN GROWTH FACTOR

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHER CRIPTIN WACHSTUMSFAKTOR

Title (fr)

CRIPTINE HUMAINE: FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE

Publication

EP 0879240 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95922961 A

Priority

US 9507087 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639420A1] A human Criptin Growth Factor polypeptide (CGF) and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide and a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for wound healing or tissue regeneration, stimulating implant fixation and angiogenesis. Antagonist against such polypeptides and their use as a therapeutic to treat and/or prevent neoplasia such as tumors is also disclosed. Diagnostic assays for identifying mutations in CGF nucleic acid sequences and altered levels of the CGF for the detection of cancer are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/475; C07K 14/52; C07K 16/22; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 14/52 (2013.01); C07K 16/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9603499 A1 19960208 - HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al
  • [E] WO 9635708 A1 19961114 - UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US]
  • [Y] EP 0298723 A1 19890111 - BIOTECHNOLOGY RES ASS [US]
  • [XY] ROSANNA DONO ET AL.,: "Isolation and characterization of the CRIPTO autosomal gene and its X-linked related sequence", AM. J. HUM. GENET., vol. 49, no. 3, 1991, pages 555 - 565, XP000872573
  • [XY] A. CICCODICOLA ET AL.,: "Molecular cloning of a gene of the 'EGF family' expressed in undifferentiated human NTERA2 teratocarcinoma cells", EMBO J., vol. 8, 1989, pages 1987 - 1991, XP000872594
  • See also references of WO 9639420A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639420 A1 19961212; AU 2766495 A 19961224; AU 714165 B2 19991223; EP 0879240 A1 19981125; EP 0879240 A4 20000503; JP H11507502 A 19990706; MX 9707617 A 19971231

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061117

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 21/04 A, 7C 07K 1/00 B, 7C 07K 14/00 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/09 B, 7C 12N 15/11 B, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12P 21/04 B, 7C 07K 14/475 B, 7C 07K 14/52 B, 7C 07K 16/22 B

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971002

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE