Global Patent Index - EP 0879279 A4

EP 0879279 A4 2000-07-12 - DIABETES THERAPY

Title (en)

DIABETES THERAPY

Title (de)

DIABETESTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

THERAPIE DES DIABETES

Publication

EP 0879279 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97905834 A

Priority

  • GB 9603847 A
  • US 9701978 W
  • US 1211196 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9729180A1] The invention provides a gene therapy method for delivering safe and effective, long-term amounts of GLP-1(7-37)-based proteins useful for treating Type I and Type II diabetes. The invention eliminates the need for subcutaneous injections and is able to provide tight glucose control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/00; A61K 48/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07K 14/605 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/605 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9729180 A1 19970814; AU 2263197 A 19970828; CA 2243718 A1 19970814; EP 0879279 A1 19981125; EP 0879279 A4 20000712; JP 2001503963 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020913

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980727

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 980727