Global Patent Index - EP 0879309 B1

EP 0879309 B1 2000-03-08 - DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE HARNESS OF A LOOM

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CHANGING THE HARNESS OF A LOOM

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM WECHSELN DES WEBGESCHIRRS EINER WEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE CHANGEMENT DE HARNAIS D'UN METIER A TISSER

Publication

EP 0879309 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96944655 A

Priority

  • DE 29601921 U
  • EP 9605834 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6056022A] PCT No. PCT/EP96/05834 Sec. 371 Date Aug. 6, 1998 Sec. 102(e) Date Aug. 6, 1998 PCT Filed Dec. 24, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/29233 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 14, 1997The invention relates to a device for changing the harness of a loom. It has two bearing columns (16) arranged on a chassis, two jibs (18) which can move vertically on the columns and horizontally extendible and a device (26) o the jibs (18) to transfer head frames. The head frame transfer device (26) comprises two spaced boundary plates 932) interconnected by at least one cross-member (28) and fitted with guide rails (30) for the head frames, and two spaced bearers (34) on a transverse support (22) connected to the boundary plates 932) and which can pivot in relation to the transverse support (22) to accept and transfer the head frames. In order to adapt the article changer to different weave widths, the distance between the boundary plates (32) can b adjusted by hand or by a motor. To this end, the cross-members (28) and the transfers support (22) consist of two simultaneously actuated teles copic sections (28', 28''; 22', 22'').

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29601921 U1 19970612; BR 9612489 A 19990720; EP 0879309 A1 19981125; EP 0879309 B1 20000308; US 6056022 A 20000502; WO 9729233 A1 19970814

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GENKINGER HEBE- UND FORDERTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2001-12-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001224

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001224

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000407

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604630 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990611

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980708

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI