Global Patent Index - EP 0879426 B1

EP 0879426 B1 2000-07-26 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL DIGITAL ULTRASOUND TRACKING SYSTEM

Title (en)

THREE-DIMENSIONAL DIGITAL ULTRASOUND TRACKING SYSTEM

Title (de)

DIGITALES DREIDIMENSIONALES ULTRASCHALL-FOLGESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE POURSUITE TRIDIMENSIONNEL NUMERIQUE A ULTRASONS

Publication

EP 0879426 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96907974 A

Priority

  • CA 9600194 W
  • US 41195995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5515853A] A method and apparatus for simultaneous measurement of multiple distances by means of networked piezoelectric transducers. Through the use of high frequency digital counters, the propagation delay between the activation of an ultrasonic transducer and the reception by similar transducers is quickly and accurately defined. By alternating the duty cycle between transmit and receive modes, the system can track and triangulate the three-dimensional positions for each transducer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/02 (2006.01); A61B 5/042 (2006.01); A61B 5/06 (2006.01); A61B 8/08 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01); A61M 25/01 (2006.01); A61M 25/08 (2006.01); G01H 3/00 (2006.01); G01H 5/00 (2006.01); G01S 5/18 (2006.01); G01S 7/52 (2006.01); G01S 7/62 (2006.01); G01S 11/14 (2006.01); G01S 15/66 (2006.01); G01S 15/87 (2006.01); G01S 15/88 (2006.01); G01S 15/89 (2006.01); A61B 8/12 (2006.01); A61B 17/34 (2006.01); A61B 18/14 (2006.01); G01S 7/521 (2006.01); G01S 15/02 (2006.01); G01S 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/0105 (2013.01); A61B 5/0422 (2013.01); A61B 8/0833 (2013.01); A61B 8/4245 (2013.01); A61B 8/483 (2013.01); A61B 34/20 (2016.02); A61B 90/10 (2016.02); A61B 90/17 (2016.02); A61B 90/36 (2016.02); G01H 3/00 (2013.01); G01H 5/00 (2013.01); G01S 5/18 (2013.01); G01S 7/5206 (2013.01); G01S 7/52074 (2013.01); G01S 7/52079 (2013.01); G01S 7/6245 (2013.01); G01S 11/14 (2013.01); G01S 15/66 (2013.01); G01S 15/87 (2013.01); G01S 15/876 (2013.01); G01S 15/88 (2013.01); G01S 15/8993 (2013.01); A61B 5/4519 (2013.01); A61B 5/4528 (2013.01); A61B 8/12 (2013.01); A61B 17/3403 (2013.01); A61B 18/14 (2013.01); A61B 90/11 (2016.02); A61B 90/39 (2016.02); A61B 2034/2051 (2016.02); A61B 2034/2063 (2016.02); A61B 2034/2072 (2016.02); A61B 2090/363 (2016.02); A61B 2090/378 (2016.02); A61B 2090/3908 (2016.02); A61B 2090/3929 (2016.02); A61B 2090/3958 (2016.02); A61B 2560/045 (2013.01); A61B 2562/0209 (2013.01); A61B 2562/043 (2013.01); A61M 2025/0166 (2013.01); G01S 7/52003 (2013.01); G01S 15/025 (2013.01); G01S 15/101 (2013.01); G01S 15/899 (2013.01); Y10S 128/916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5515853 A 19960514; AT 195024 T 20000815; AU 5140496 A 19961023; CA 2215508 A1 19961010; DE 69609529 D1 20000831; DE 69609529 T2 20010329; EP 0879426 A2 19981125; EP 0879426 B1 20000726; JP H11503629 A 19990330; WO 9631753 A2 19961010; WO 9631753 A3 19970206

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69609529

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-11-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-10-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609529 20000831

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195024 T 20000815

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990224

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE