Global Patent Index - EP 0879567 B1

EP 0879567 B1 2001-12-19 - Protective helmet, in particular military protective helmet

Title (en)

Protective helmet, in particular military protective helmet

Title (de)

Schutzhelm, insbesondere militärischer Schutzhelm

Title (fr)

Casque de protection, en particulier casque de protection à usage militaire

Publication

EP 0879567 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108015 A

Priority

DE 19721329 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879567A1] Shock-absorbing liner of a military protective helmet (1) includes a headband (22) with a fitting (15) at the end which plugs into and is retained by a locking part (10) on the helmet shell. The chin strap arrangement (18) is detachably fastened at points common to the headband. Socket locking parts are preferably fitted at all fastening points for the headband on the helmet shell and the end has tabs with apertures (23) through which the fitting can be passed, a lug (20) on the fitting pressing the tab on the socket part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/14; A42B 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 1/04 (2006.01); A42B 3/08 (2006.01); A42B 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/08 (2013.01); A42B 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879567 A1 19981125; EP 0879567 B1 20011219; CZ 290855 B6 20021016; CZ 9801418 A3 19990113; DE 19721329 A1 19981126; DE 19721329 C2 19990812; ES 2166116 T3 20020401; NO 313859 B1 20021216; NO 982291 A 19981123; NO 982291 D0 19980520

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180621

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2018-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802500

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802500

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2011-08-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *SCHUBERTH HELME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-08-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *SCHUBERTH HELME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110819

2011-08-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHUBERTH HELME GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHUBERTH WERK GMBH, 38106 BRAUNSCHWEIG, DE

- Document: DE 59802500

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802500

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802500

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20110621

2011-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCHUBERTH HELME GMBH

- Free text: SCHUBERTH-WERK GMBH & CO. KG#REBENRING 31#D-38106 BRAUNSCHWEIG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHUBERTH HELME GMBH#STEGELITZER STRASSE 12#39126 MAGDEBURG (DE)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166116 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802500 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES LI NL

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES LI NL

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981224

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES LI NL

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI