Global Patent Index - EP 0879572 B1

EP 0879572 B1 2002-09-04 - Supporting body for the ends of the slats of a slatted base for a bed, a bench or the like

Title (en)

Supporting body for the ends of the slats of a slatted base for a bed, a bench or the like

Title (de)

Lagerkörper für die Enden der Latten eines Lattenrostes für ein Bett, eine Bank oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Embout pour extrémité de lattes équipant un sommier à lattes, une banquette ou similaire

Publication

EP 0879572 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97870072 A

Priority

EP 97870072 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879572A1] The fixing consists of a hollow rectangular-section body (1) which fastens to the end of a slat (2) and is equipped with projecting studs (6) shaped to engage with holes (7) in a hollow side rail (3). The side rail is of metal and e.g. of square or round cross-section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/064 (2013.01); A47C 23/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879572 A1 19981125; EP 0879572 B1 20020904; DE 69715155 D1 20021010; DE 69715155 T2 20030417; DK 0879572 T3 20030106; ES 2182018 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SEDAC-MECOBEL

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050524

2006-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-04-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-05-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-04-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182018 T3

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2003-01-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715155 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010130

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971208

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI