Global Patent Index - EP 0879683 A3

EP 0879683 A3 2000-12-20 - Diamond type cutting tool, with low noise emission, for sawing stone materials, and machine using said tool

Title (en)

Diamond type cutting tool, with low noise emission, for sawing stone materials, and machine using said tool

Title (de)

Geräuscharmes Steinschneidwerkzeug und dieses Werkzeug verwendende Maschine

Title (fr)

Outil à couper de la pierre à faible émission sonore et machine utilisant celui-ci

Publication

EP 0879683 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98109353 A

Priority

  • IT MI971214 A
  • IT MI971991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879683A2] The invention relates to a cutting tool, in particular a diamond-tipped cutting tool for cutting stone materials, formed by a sheet steel support core (1) with a plurality of cutting elements (2), such as highly abrasive diamond segments which are fixed at intervals along its cutting edge. In order to achieve sound-damping of said tool, a series of substantially parallel incisions (3), arranged inclined with respect to the cutting edge at an angle of 20 DEG to 40 DEG is formed in a central zone of said sheet metal support core, the ends of each incision, which are formed in the manner of a curl (3a), being located above the ends of the incisions adjacent thereto. Moreover, filling segments (5) are arranged between the diamond segments, said filling segments being fixed to the bottom edge of the blades in a manner similar to the said diamond segments, with the function of increasing the bearing contact area of the blades inside the cutting groove. The invention also relates to a frame-type cutting machine, the blade-carrying group of which has, associated with it, damping means suitable for preventing the generation and/or the propagation of acoustic vibrations, such as calibrated spacer strips and/or damping blocks which are made of resilient sound-absorbing material and arranged between each pair of blades and/or between the latter and the frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/12; B28D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 61/12 (2006.01); B28D 1/06 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/127 (2013.01); B23D 61/123 (2013.01); B28D 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879683 A2 19981125; EP 0879683 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-09-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010718

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GR IT PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010616

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GR IT PT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI