Global Patent Index - EP 0879750 B1

EP 0879750 B1 2002-11-06 - Improvements in bogie trucks for rail vehicles

Title (en)

Improvements in bogie trucks for rail vehicles

Title (de)

Verbessertes Drehgestell für Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Bogie amelioré pour véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 0879750 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98304031 A

Priority

  • GB 9710654 A
  • GB 9714085 A
  • GB 9720906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879750A1] A bogie truck for a rail vehicle comprises a pair of spaced side frames (10), front and rear wheel and axle sets (17) extending transversely between the side frames and rotatable in bearing assemblies (20) which are connected by primary suspension means (23) to the side frames. A transverse bolster (11) is connected between the side frames and has a mounting, including secondary suspension means (32), for connection to the rail vehicle. The total vertical stiffness ofthe secondary suspension means (32) is greater than the total vertical stiffness of the primary suspension means (23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/14; B61F 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/00 (2006.01); B61F 5/14 (2006.01); B61F 5/30 (2006.01); B61F 5/32 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/142 (2013.01); B61F 5/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879750 A1 19981125; EP 0879750 B1 20021106; CZ 297831 B6 20070411; CZ 9801594 A3 19990113; DE 69809120 D1 20021212; DE 69809120 T2 20030717; ES 2184199 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20161114

2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) LIMITED, GB

- Effective date: 20161114

2016-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69809120

2016-09-28 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: DB CARGO RAIL (UK) LIMITED; GB

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN NAAM VAN DE EIGENAAR(S); FORMER OWNER NAME: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED

- Effective date: 20160725

2016-09-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) LTD

- Effective date: 20160914

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 69809120

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LTD., DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 69809120

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DB CARGO (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, DONCASTER, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LTD., LONDON, GB

- Document: DE 69809120

- Effective date: 20130726

2013-09-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130913

2013-08-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DB SCHENKER RAIL (UK) HOLDINGS LIMITED, GB

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ENGLISH WELSH AND SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMITED, GB

2013-07-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809120

2009-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-12-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-12-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2008-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMITED

- Free text: POWELL DUFFRYN RAIL LIMITED#CAMBRIAN HOUSE, CHARNWOOD COURT#PARC NANTGARW, CARDIFF CF15 7QZ (GB) -TRANSFER TO- ENGLISH WELSH & SCOTTISH RAILWAY HOLDINGS LIMITED#MCBEATH HOUSE 310 GOSWELL ROAD#LONDON EC1V 7LW (GB)

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184199 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809120 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POWELL DUFFRYN RAIL LIMITED

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-04-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMPROVEMENTS IN BOGIE TRUCKS FOR RAIL VEHICLES

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI NL SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI