Global Patent Index - EP 0879771 B1

EP 0879771 B1 2000-11-02 - Transport and storing container for liquids

Title (en)

Transport and storing container for liquids

Title (de)

Transport- und Lagerbehälter für Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Récipient de transport et de stockage pour liquides

Publication

EP 0879771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108202 A

Priority

DE 19720931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879771A1] This new container transports and stores fluids. Its interchangeable plastic vessel is surrounded by vertical and horizontal metal rods forming an enclosing cage. The underframe resembles a palette. The vessel has four sidewalls, a top and bottom. Its upper filling opening has a closure, the lower outlet has a valve for emptying. In novel design, a supportive insert (18) intervenes between container (2) and outer cage (9). This comprises four side walls (18a-d) in electrically-conductive material. Preferably this insert (18) and the under frame (12) are made of metal or an electrically-conductive plastic, e.g. polyethylene with a proportion of conductive carbon black.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/10 (2006.01); B65D 19/38 (2006.01); B65D 77/04 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); B65D 90/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/0466 (2013.01); B65D 2213/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879771 A1 19981125; EP 0879771 B1 20001102; AR 008342 A1 19991229; AU 6597098 A 19981126; AU 739967 B2 20011025; BR 9801663 A 19990914; CN 1094873 C 20021127; CN 1199702 A 19981125; DE 19720931 A1 19981203; DE 19720931 C2 19991202; DE 59800321 D1 20001207; DK 0879771 T3 20010108; ES 2151305 T3 20001216; JP 3574327 B2 20041006; JP H1129144 A 19990202; MY 125885 A 20060830; NO 318589 B1 20050411; NO 982278 A 19981123; NO 982278 D0 19980519; PL 192620 B1 20061130; PL 326378 A1 19981123; RU 2184062 C2 20020627; US 5971185 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121011 AND 20121017

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151305

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800321

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990201

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990201

1999-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI