Global Patent Index - EP 0879906 B1

EP 0879906 B1 2001-12-19 - Process and device for spinning solutions of cellulose carbamate

Title (en)

Process and device for spinning solutions of cellulose carbamate

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verspinnen von Cellulosecarbamat-Lösungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour filer des solutions de carbamate de cellulose

Publication

EP 0879906 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108315 A

Priority

DE 19721609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879906A2] For spinning a solution of cellulose carbamate, by extrusion through a jet into a precipitation bath, the extruded filaments are shrouded by a flow of the bath medium in a structured cross section from the jet outlet to the bath surface, moving in the same direction as the filaments. The flow speed of the bath medium at the jet outlet (X1) is 01-0.8 times the filament take-off speed, and the flow speed at the exit from the bath (X3) is 0.96-1.1 times the take-off speed. Also claimed is an appts. with a feed (12) to the precipitation bath (15) for the precipitation medium. A flow body, within the bath container, is a spinning jet (3) with a truncated cone shape and a truncated cone spinning funnel (5) with a cylindrical tube (6) through the wall of the bath container. An external mechanical filament take-off (9) is outside the bath. The point of the spinning jet (3) is immersed into the funnel (5), to give a concentric gap between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/06; D01F 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/06 (2006.01); D01F 2/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/24 (2013.01); D01D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879906 A2 19981125; EP 0879906 A3 19981230; EP 0879906 B1 20011219; AT 211190 T 20020115; DE 19721609 A1 19981126; ES 2165641 T3 20020316; US 5968433 A 19991019; US 6234778 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070507

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060508

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060507

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060508

2006-05-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060507

2006-05-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060507

2006-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060507

2005-05-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165641 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802501 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211190 T 20020115

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010213

1999-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FI FR GB IT

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LURGI ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-12-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI