Global Patent Index - EP 0879909 B1

EP 0879909 B1 2002-09-04 - Loom having linear motor-driven shedding motion mechanism

Title (en)

Loom having linear motor-driven shedding motion mechanism

Title (de)

Webmaschine mit linearmotorgetriebener Fachbildungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Métier à tisser avec dispositif de formation de la foule entrainé par moteur linéaire

Publication

EP 0879909 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98108242 A

Priority

JP 11801597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879909A1] One shedding motion mechanism comprises a guide frame (5,12), a heald frame (2,11) and linear motors (1,16). A loom is composed of a plurality of such shedding motion mechanisms, which are arrayed in series. The narrower the pitch between adjacent heald frames (2,11) is, the better it is taking into consideration the magnitude of the vertical movement of the heald frames (2,11) located further from the front of the loom. However, since the linear motors (1,16) have to possess sufficient propulsive force to drive the heald frames (2,11), such miniaturization has its limits. Thus, the mounting positions of the linear motors (1,16) of adjacent shedding motion mechanisms are shifted so that the linear motors may not interfere with each other. According to an embodiment of this invention, this can be implemented by vertically shifting the positions of the shedding motion mechanisms with respect to each other. Or the positions of the linear motors (1,16) can be prevented from overlapping by using heald frame (2,11) with different horizontal lengths. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 5/00; D03C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 5/00 (2006.01); D03C 13/00 (2006.01); D03D 5/00 (2006.01); H02K 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 13/00 (2013.01); D03C 5/00 (2013.01); D03C 13/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879909 A1 19981125; EP 0879909 B1 20020904; DE 69807572 D1 20021010; DE 69807572 T2 20030116; EP 1215318 A2 20020619; JP H10310949 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI K.K.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807572 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR IT LI

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980506

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI