Global Patent Index - EP 0879916 A3

EP 0879916 A3 2001-12-12 - Process for the treatment of dyed fibrous materials made from natural or synthetic polyamide

Title (en)

Process for the treatment of dyed fibrous materials made from natural or synthetic polyamide

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von gefärbten, natürlichen oder synthetischen Polyamidfasermaterialien

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de matériaux fibreux teints en polyamide naturel ou synthetique

Publication

EP 0879916 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810430 A

Priority

CH 117197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879916A2] A process for fixing dyes on natural or synthetic polyamide fibre materials, in which the fabric is treated before, during or after dyeing with a solution containing a homo- or co-polymer (I) with repeat units of formula (1), (2) and/or (3). In the formulae, R1-R4 and R6 = H, 1-6C alkylsulphonyl, optionally substituted phenyl, benzoyl or phenylsulphonyl (optionally substituted in the benzene ring) or 1-12C alkyl (optionally substituted with hydroxy, carboxy, cyano, carbamoyl, the group -CONH-(alk)-T, N,N-di-(1-4C alkyl)-carbamoyl, -SO2-Pn-NH2, -SO2-Pn-NHCOR8, -SO2Ph substituted with NH2 and SO3H, amino, -NHR9, -N(R9)2, -N(R9)3<+> Y<-> or -COO-(alk)-T); (alk) = 1-10C alkylene; T = H or amino groups as above; Pn = phenylene; Ph = phenyl; R8, R9 = 1-6C alkyl; Y = anion; R5 = H, benzyl or a 1-12C alkyl group as for R1-R4 etc.; R7 = H or 1-4C alkyl. Also claimed are homo- or co-polymers containing units of formula (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/52; C08F 8/34; C08F 26/02; D06P 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 3/24 (2006.01); D06P 1/52 (2006.01); D06P 5/00 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01); D06P 5/08 (2006.01); D06P 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/06 (2013.01); D06P 1/5242 (2013.01); D06P 5/08 (2013.01); D06P 3/04 (2013.01); Y10S 8/917 (2013.01); Y10S 8/924 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0685591 A1 19951206 - NICCA CHEMICAL CO [JP]
  • [A] WO 9408092 A1 19940414 - BASF AG [DE], et al
  • [XP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 04 31 March 1998 (1998-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 09 31 October 1995 (1995-10-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879916 A2 19981125; EP 0879916 A3 20011212; EP 0879916 B1 20030625; CA 2237924 A1 19981120; CN 1199794 A 19981125; DE 59808788 D1 20030731; JP 3938630 B2 20070627; JP H10325084 A 19981208; US 5948125 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100512

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIBA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS HOLDING INC.

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808788 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF FIBROUS MATERIALS MADE FROM NATURAL OR SYNTHETIC POLYAMIDE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990427

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06P 1/52 A, 7D 06P 5/08 B, 7C 08F 8/34 B, 7C 08F 26/02 B

1999-05-06 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19981125

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI