Global Patent Index - EP 0879928 A3

EP 0879928 A3 2001-04-18 - Door remote control device for motor vehicle

Title (en)

Door remote control device for motor vehicle

Title (de)

Fernbedienbare Tuersteuereinrichtung fuer Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à distance de porte pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0879928 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106341 A

Priority

DE 19721420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0879928A2] the controller has at least one radio frequency receiver and a transmitter with at least one control key which transmits a radio frequency signal depending on the actuation of the key. A radio frequency receiver is integrated into the motor vehicle's third brake light and is connected via at least one cable to a processing device. The signal is transferred in the base band over the connecting cable to the processing device. The receiver has a self-clocking oscillator and a low pass filter for demodulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; B60R 16/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0879928 A2 19981125; EP 0879928 A3 20010418; DE 19721420 A1 19981126; DE 19721420 C2 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI