Global Patent Index - EP 0880001 B1

EP 0880001 B1 2002-09-18 - Process for drying paints on metallic or non-metallic components or assemblies of any structure

Title (en)

Process for drying paints on metallic or non-metallic components or assemblies of any structure

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Trocknung von Lacken auf metallischen oder nichtmetallischen Einzelteilen oder montierten Baugruppen beliebiger Struktur

Title (fr)

Procédé de séchage de peintures sur des pièces détachées ou assemblées métalliques ou non-métalliques d'une structure quelconque

Publication

EP 0880001 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107504 A

Priority

  • DE 19721461 A
  • DE 19730879 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0880001A1] A process (A) for drying paint on metallic or non-metallic parts or mounted assemblies of any structure, involves using a continuous or static system in a heated drying space, especially water- dilutable or solvent-containing 1- or 2-component epoxy- or polyurethane-based paint on aluminium components or on fibre composite components for aircraft. The drying space is heated by means of microwaves generated in a microwave module and conducted via waveguides with a defined outlet, and air is made to flow round the substrates in the room. Drying air contains a dipolar additive (I) in a predetermined controllable amount within the range of 20-90%, which is kept constant during the process. Also claimed is a process (B) in which the paint is treated with a polarisable dielectric as additive (II), this additive being used directly to increase the temperature of the paint film during microwave irradiation and/or to increase the temperature of the air/additive mixture by extraction from the paint into the surrounding air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/347

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/34 (2006.01); F26B 3/347 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/347 (2013.01); F26B 3/343 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0880001 A1 19981125; EP 0880001 B1 20020918; AT 224524 T 20021015; CA 2238314 A1 19981122; CA 2238314 C 20050906; DE 19721461 A1 19981126; DE 19721461 C2 19990311; DE 19730879 A1 19990211; DE 19730879 B4 20060914; DK 0880001 T3 20030127; ES 2184165 T3 20030401; NO 317954 B1 20050110; NO 982263 A 19981123; NO 982263 D0 19980518; US 5974687 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150425

2016-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 224524 T

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140424

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140424

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140425

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140424

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805571

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140424

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-24 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805571

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-10-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20110930

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184165 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805571 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224524 T 20021015

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010227

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS AIRBUS GMBH

1999-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-03-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AIRBUS GESELLSCHAFT MIT

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980916

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI