Global Patent Index - EP 0880003 B1

EP 0880003 B1 2002-11-13 - Closable ventilation grille for an armoured vehicle

Title (en)

Closable ventilation grille for an armoured vehicle

Title (de)

Verschliessbarer Kühlluftgrill für ein Panzerfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Grille d'aération obturable pour véhicule blindé

Publication

EP 0880003 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108099 A

Priority

AT 31397 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0880003A2] The grill covering the radiator of an armoured vehicle, which can be opened and closed, has two frames (7,8) where the blades (11,12) are aligned against each other in opposite angles (16,17) in cross section. The thickness (18) of the blades (11,12) on the dividing plane (15) is larger than the gap (19) to the next blade (11,12) in the same frame. In the open position, converging-diverging flow channels (22,23) are formed between the blades (11,12) aligned between each other in both frames (7,8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/035 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86759 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0880003 A2 19981125; EP 0880003 A3 19991208; EP 0880003 B1 20021113; AT 2266 U1 19980727; DE 59806238 D1 20021219; ES 2185080 T3 20030416; PL 108030 U1 19981207; PL 60081 Y1 20031231; US 6082404 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080504

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080504

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040505

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-05-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185080 T3

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806238 20021219

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH SPEZIALFAHRZEUG AG & CO. KG

2000-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000314

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI