Global Patent Index - EP 0880197 A3

EP 0880197 A3 2000-01-05 - Clamping screw for connecting electrical conductors

Title (en)

Clamping screw for connecting electrical conductors

Title (de)

Schraubklemme zum Anschliessen elektrischer Leiter

Title (fr)

Duille de contact à vis pour la connexion de conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0880197 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108541 A

Priority

DE 29709111 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0880197A2] The screw terminal/clamp (1) has a clamping yoke (2) as a pressure piece, a bolt and a clamp body (4). The bolt is clamped in the clamp yoke and adjustable wrt. the clamp body via a thread in the clamp body, the adjustment also causing the clamp yoke to move with the bolt. The bolt is a standard threaded pin (3) whose flattened off region (8) lies within a roof-shaped first arm (5) of the pressure piece (2). The bolt is held in a cylindrical recess in a second arm of the pressure piece. The first arm is solid, i.e. has no through holes

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/30; H01R 4/36; H01R 4/38; H01R 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29709111 U1 19970724; CN 1200583 A 19981202; EP 0880197 A2 19981125; EP 0880197 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-10-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/30 A, 7H 01R 4/36 B, 7H 01R 4/38 B, 7H 01R 9/09 B

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI