Global patent index - EP 0880198 A3

EP 0880198 A3 2000-01-05 - Frame clamp for connecting an electric conductor

Title (en)

Frame clamp for connecting an electric conductor

Title (de)

Rahmenklemme zum Anschluss elektrischer Leitungen

Title (fr)

Prise de châssis pour connexion de conducteur électrique

Publication

EP 0880198 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108542 A

Priority

DE 29709112 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0880198A2] The frame or loop clamp has a box-type tubular cover (1) which is attached to a switching device and is used to connect electrical conductors and consists of a clamp body (2), a clamping yoke (3) and a clamping bolt (4). The frame clamp is inserted into the clamp cover and latches into it via its yoke in the open state. Protrusions (6) on the inner wall of the clamp cover hold the clamp body away from the latched yoke until the clamp screw is tightened. Ribs with rear recesses (8) are used to latch the frame clamp to the inner walls of the clamp cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/36; H01H 9/02; H01R 4/30; H01R 4/38; H01R 9/16; H01R 9/18; H01R 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/363 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29709112 U1 19970731; CN 1200584 A 19981202; EP 0880198 A2 19981125; EP 0880198 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 4/36 A, 7H 01R 9/18 B, 7H 01R 9/16 B, 7H 01R 9/22 B, 7H 01R 4/30 B, 7H 01H 9/02 B, 7H 01R 4/38 B

1998-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI