Global Patent Index - EP 0880621 B1

EP 0880621 B1 2000-09-06 - MANUFACTURING ELASTIC RAIL CLAMPS

Title (en)

MANUFACTURING ELASTIC RAIL CLAMPS

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ELASTISCHE SCHIENENKLAMMER

Title (fr)

FABRICATION DE PINCES A RAIL ELASTIQUES

Publication

EP 0880621 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97904527 A

Priority

  • GB 9700381 W
  • GB 9600319 W
  • GB 9620203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730225A1] In a method of manufacturing a rail clamp (13), for fastening a rail to an underlying rail plate or rail tie, the rail clamp is made from a blank formed of round bar stock which is pressed such that the blank has rounded edges. The method is applicable to the manufacture of a rail clamp of the type comprising a pair of substantially parallel members (14) folded into a D configuration so as to have a front portion adapted to seat on a flange of the rail, which front portion is formed by respective free ends of the substantially parallel members, and a base portion (12) adapted to seat in a slot in the rail plate or rail tie or in an anchoring device secured to the rail plate or rail tie.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/303 (2013.01); E01B 9/306 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730225 A1 19970821; AU 1730297 A 19970902; BG 102681 A 19990430; DE 69703029 D1 20001012; EA 000383 B1 19990624; EA 199800716 A1 19990429; EP 0880621 A1 19981202; EP 0880621 B1 20000906; PL 183779 B1 20020731; PL 328327 A1 19990118; TR 9801560 T2 19981123

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2007-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-08 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-12-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703029 20001012

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GR IT NL

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19980908;RO PAYMENT 19980908;SI PAYMENT 19980908

2000-09-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991022

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980908

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GR IT NL

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 980908;RO PAYMENT 980908;SI PAYMENT 980908