Global Patent Index - EP 0880725 A4

EP 0880725 A4 2000-01-05 - PROJECTOR

Title (en)

PROJECTOR

Title (de)

PROJEKTOR

Title (fr)

PROJECTEUR

Publication

EP 0880725 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96925058 A

Priority

  • IL 9600065 W
  • US 54321995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714076A1] A projector including a non-polarized light source (10), a polarizing beam-splitter (12) receiving light from the non-polarized light source and a selectably actuatable polarization rotating light valve (16) having light polarized in one sense from the polarizing beam-splitter impinging thereon from a first direction and having light polarized in an opposite sense from the polarizing beam-splitter impinging thereon from a second direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03B 21/14; H04N 5/74; H04N 9/31

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 33/12 (2006.01); G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G03B 21/14 (2006.01); H04N 9/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/3108 (2013.01); H04N 9/3167 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714076 A1 19970417; AU 6529996 A 19970430; CA 2234643 A1 19970417; CN 1214127 A 19990414; EP 0880725 A1 19981202; EP 0880725 A4 20000105; JP H11513504 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020625

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-01-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991123

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03B 21/14 A, 7H 04N 9/31 B, 7H 04N 5/74 B

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL