Global Patent Index - EP 0880732 B1

EP 0880732 B1 2000-02-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXAMINING AND/OR ADJUSTING VALVES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXAMINING AND/OR ADJUSTING VALVES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG UND/ODER EINSTELLUNG VON VENTILEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXAMEN ET/OU DE REGLAGE DE SOUPAPES

Publication

EP 0880732 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909134 A

Priority

  • DE 9702081 W
  • DE 19648689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19648689A1] The present invention pertains to a method and a device for examining and/or adjusting valves, especially injector valves in an internal combustion engine. The valve is activated by means of an agreed control signal in order for a signal (QK) characterizing the fuel flow to be determined. The activating element is a gas. A first quantity (QPN) characterizing the gas flow and/or a second quantity (IAN, IAB) is determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 7/00; F01L 3/06; F01L 9/02; F02D 41/30; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); G05D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19648689 A1 19980528; CN 1147766 C 20040428; CN 1208476 A 19990217; EP 0880732 A1 19981202; EP 0880732 B1 20000216; ES 2143853 T3 20000516; JP 2000504389 A 20000411; JP 4083230 B2 20080430; RU 2189488 C2 20020920; US 6311553 B1 20011106; WO 9824014 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143853 T3

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701133 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOEFFEL, EBERHARD

2000-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SEIDEL, JOSEF

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT