Global Patent Index - EP 0880767 B1

EP 0880767 B1 2000-01-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DE-ICING AN INTAKE APERTURE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DE-ICING AN INTAKE APERTURE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTEISEN EINER ANSAUGÖFFNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DEGIVRER UN ORIFICE D'ASPIRATION

Publication

EP 0880767 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97904439 A

Priority

  • DE 19605842 A
  • EP 9700683 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19605842C1] The invention concerns a method and device for de-icing an intake aperture (2) in an intake duct (1) of a fire-alarm system, through which duct air from the room or apparatus is drawn in and fed to a detector for detecting a fire parameter. In order to effectively prevent an accumulation of ice at the intake aperture (2), a resilient element with a through-hole (3) coaxial to the intake aperture (2) is disposed in or on the latter, a blast of compressed air acting upon the resilient element in order to de-ice the intake aperture (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 17/10 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19605842 C1 19970424; AT 188797 T 20000115; CZ 290139 B6 20020612; CZ 9802577 A3 19990113; EP 0880767 A1 19981202; EP 0880767 B1 20000112; ES 2142663 T3 20000416; GR 3033076 T3 20000831; HU 220910 B1 20020629; HU 9901015 A2 19990728; HU 9901015 A3 19991129; NO 329265 B1 20100920; NO 983734 A 19980814; NO 983734 D0 19980814; PL 183402 B1 20020628; PL 328346 A1 19990118; PT 880767 E 20000428; SK 109998 A3 19990806; SK 284906 B6 20060202; US 6143090 A 20001107; WO 9730428 A1 19970821

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2015-04-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150406

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140813

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701001

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-10-23 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000400765

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 188797 T

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701001

2014-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-08-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140813

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130206

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 188797 T

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-05-28 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WAGNER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-03-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-03-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-02-29 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WAGNER ALARM- UND SICHERUNGSSYSTEME GMBH, DE

2011-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111201 AND 20111207

2011-12-28 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142663 T3

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701001 20000217

2000-02-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20000216

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188797 T 20000115

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990705

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE