Global Patent Index - EP 0880805 A4

EP 0880805 A4 2000-04-26 - STAMPED POWER CONTACT

Title (en)

STAMPED POWER CONTACT

Title (de)

GESTANZTER LEISTUNGSKONTAKT

Title (fr)

CONTACT ELECTRIQUE MATRICE

Publication

EP 0880805 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97905738 A

Priority

  • US 9701751 W
  • US 1106096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728579A1] A power port terminal formed by stamping from a blank of conductive material comprises a contact receiving socket portion (12) and an integral mounting portion (14). The socket includes a web with a plurality of beams (20) thereon. The inner surface of the beams on the bends thereof define a substantially continuous cylindrical contact surface at a predetermined point along the reference axis of the terminal. The contact surface has a predetermined constricted dimension (36) measured in a plane perpendicular to the reference axis, this dimension being the most constricted dimension along the reference axis of the terminal. The terminal is thereby able to accomodate a pin of any desired axial length. The trailing mounting portion has a set of mounting legs (46) thereon, that in the preferred instance, extend generally perpendicular to the reference axis of the terminal. Latch tabs (38) may be provided on one or more of the beams. There are lateral projections (62) on the mounting portion, which restrain the terminal from pivoting on its longitudinal axis when it is mounted in a through hole (52) in an insulative housing (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/09; H01R 13/11; H01R 13/432

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); H01R 12/55 (2011.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/727 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9728579A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728579 A1 19970807; DE 69720968 D1 20030522; DE 69720968 T2 20040129; EP 0880805 A1 19981202; EP 0880805 A4 20000426; EP 0880805 B1 20030416; JP 2000504149 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69720968 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/04 A, 7H 01R 12/32 B, 7H 01R 13/432 B, 7H 01R 13/11 B

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-04-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980820

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB