Global Patent Index - EP 0880858 A4

EP 0880858 A4 2000-12-27 - FACSIMILE-BASED VIDEO COMPRESSION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (en)

FACSIMILE-BASED VIDEO COMPRESSION METHOD AND SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FAKSIMILEBASIERTEN VIDEOKOMPRESSION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMPRESSION D'IMAGES VIDEO BASES SUR LA TELECOPIE

Publication

EP 0880858 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97904138 A

Priority

  • US 9701566 W
  • US 60604396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730550A1] A method and system (10) for compressing and decompressing video image data in real time employs thresholding and facsimile-based encoding to eliminate the need for computationally intense two-dimensional transform-based compression techniques. The method operates first by forming a difference frame which contains only information pertaining to the difference between a current video image frame and a computed approximation of the video image frame. The difference frame is fed to a thresholder (32) which categorizes each pixel in the frame as being either in a first set having intensities above or at a preset threshold, or a second set having intensities below a preset threshold. A facsimile-based compression algorithm in an encoder (44) is then employed to encode the first set of above or at threshold pixel locations. To compress the intensity data for each above or at threshold pixel, a quantizer (40) and a lossless encoder (50) are preferably employed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/32 (2006.01); H04N 7/36 (2006.01); H04N 7/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/00 (2013.01); H04N 19/503 (2013.01); H04N 19/507 (2014.11); H04N 19/587 (2014.11); H04N 19/59 (2014.11); H04N 19/93 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4688108 A 19870818 - COTTON ROBERT V [US], et al
  • [E] US 5917952 A 19990629 - NOH JAE [US]
  • [A] EP 0370322 A2 19900530 - SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]
  • [PA] EP 0755155 A2 19970122 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
  • [A] US 5008747 A 19910416 - CARR MICHAEL D [GB], et al
  • [X] ANONYMOUS: "High Performance Exact Gray Scale Compression Technique. February 1982.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 9, 1 February 1982 (1982-02-01), New York, US, pages 4513 - 4516, XP002150853
  • [X] SAUER K ET AL: "BAYESIAN BLOCK-WISE SEGMENTATION OF INTERFRAME DIFFERENCES IN VIDEO SEQUENCES*", CVGIP GRAPHICAL MODELS AND IMAGE PROCESSING,US,ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MA, vol. 55, no. 2, 1 March 1993 (1993-03-01), pages 129 - 139, XP000364280, ISSN: 1077-3169
  • [A] TUBARO S. ET AL: "Motion field estimators and their application to image interpolation", 1993, KLUWER ACADEMIC, USA, NORWELL, MASSACHUSETTS, XP002150854
  • See also references of WO 9730550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730550 A1 19970821; AU 1851097 A 19970902; CA 2244809 A1 19970821; CA 2244809 C 20050621; EP 0880858 A1 19981202; EP 0880858 A4 20001227; JP 2000504911 A 20000418; US 5740278 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090331

2005-08-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-12-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BERGER, TOBY

1999-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHIU, YI-JEN

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980806

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE