Global patent index - EP 0880919 A3

EP 0880919 A3 2000-09-20 - Device for supporting a monitor

Title (en)

Device for supporting a monitor

Title (de)

Tragvorrichtung für einen Monitor

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'un moniteur

Publication

EP 0880919 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109065 A

Priority

DE 19722213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0880919A2] The TV monitor (20) is secured to a support plate (22) which has a swivel mounting (26,30) in a support platform (28) the underside of which has two stubs (34) which locate into the top ends of two vertical support rails (40) for a racking system. The mounting does not encroach on any rack space. The support platform can be triangular with the swivel mounting in the front apex of the triangle. The stub fittings can be located on strips slid into the slotted rack supports. The fitting can also be applied to other equipment eg. a video recorder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/00; A47B 21/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0880919 A2 19981202; EP 0880919 A3 20000920; DE 19722213 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010622

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47B 21/00 A, 7A 47B 21/03 B

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR NL

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI