Global Patent Index - EP 0881004 A3

EP 0881004 A3 2000-12-27 - Method of rolling steel shapes

Title (en)

Method of rolling steel shapes

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Walzen von Stahlprofilen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour laminer des profilés en acier

Publication

EP 0881004 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109418 A

Priority

DE 19722732 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881004A2] The method concerns rolling of steel sections in beam rolling mills with alternating X and H rolling and controlled cooling of the material during rolling. During preliminary rolling in an X roll stand, cooling water channels (8a, 8b) are formed in zones where the web and flange of the beam join one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/08; B21B 45/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/088 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 13/12 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/14 (2006.01); B21B 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/088 (2013.01); B21B 45/0215 (2013.01); B21B 1/14 (2013.01); B21B 2013/003 (2013.01); B21B 2027/103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 1143735 A 19150622 - SLICK EDWIN E [US]
  • [A] EP 0760263 A1 19970305 - SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]
  • [A] EP 0734792 A2 19961002 - MANNESMANN AG [DE]
  • [DA] EP 0256409 A2 19880224 - SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 240 (M - 251) 25 October 1983 (1983-10-25)
  • [A] PANUNZI C ET AL: "QST-BEHANDLUNG VON SCHWEREN TRAEGERPROFILEN", STAHL UND EISEN,DE,VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DUSSELDORF, vol. 110, no. 6, 14 June 1990 (1990-06-14), pages 39 - 43,194, XP000140619, ISSN: 0340-4803
  • [DA] FRANTZ A ET AL: "VERBESSERTE THERMOMRCHANISCHE WALZPROZESSE FUR SCHWERE TRAGERPROFILE", STAHL UND EISEN,DE,VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DUSSELDORF, no. 9/10, 16 May 1989 (1989-05-16), pages 497 - 502,302, XP000068362, ISSN: 0340-4803
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 428 (M - 1025) 14 September 1990 (1990-09-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 132 (M - 1229) 3 April 1992 (1992-04-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 189 (M - 099) 28 November 1981 (1981-11-28)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198851, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M21, AN 1988-366693 [51], XP002151677

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881004 A2 19981202; EP 0881004 A3 20001227; DE 19722732 A1 19981203; JP H1177104 A 19990323; US 5966977 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 1/08 A, 7B 21B 45/02 B

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980525

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI