Global Patent Index - EP 0881005 A3

EP 0881005 A3 2001-03-21 - Method and device for tilting rolled sections, for example billets, about their longitudinal axis

Title (en)

Method and device for tilting rolled sections, for example billets, about their longitudinal axis

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kanten- oder Spiesskanten von Walzprofilen, beispielsweise Knüppeln, um ihre Längsachse

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour pivoter des profilés laminés, tels que des billettes, autour de leur axe longitudinal

Publication

EP 0881005 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109417 A

Priority

DE 19722879 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881005A2] The method concerns tilting a rolled section (30) about its longitudinal axis. The apparatus includes a frame which can be moved across a roller conveyor (29), transporting the section, and has clamping rolls (1, 2) installed in a roll head (11). The roll head is pivoted about an axis parallel to the longitudinal axis of the section, and has a pivot drive (11). During tilting, the section (30) held by the rolls (1, 2) is lifted above the transport plane X-X of the roller conveyor (29). The movable clamping roll (1) is actuated using a cylinder unit (3). The height of the roll head (11) can be altered using a cylinder unit (26) joined to a lever (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 39/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881005 A2 19981202; EP 0881005 A3 20010321; DE 19722879 A1 19981203; DE 19722879 C2 20031030; US 6086318 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980525

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI