Global Patent Index - EP 0881023 A3

EP 0881023 A3 2000-08-23 - Cutting tool with cutting teeth or abrasive cutting edge

Title (en)

Cutting tool with cutting teeth or abrasive cutting edge

Title (de)

Schneid- und Schleifwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de coupe abrasif ou à dents de coupe

Publication

EP 0881023 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810492 A

Priority

  • CH 125497 A
  • CH 195297 A
  • CH 250297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881023A2] The cutting and grinding tool (11) is designed for use on a machine tool with an oscillating action. It has a cutting edge (13) fitted with teeth on one or more straight sections (21). The cutting edge is at a length of the tool away from the axis. The points of the teeth, at the cutting edge, are at two or more sections at an obtuse angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23D 61/12; B28D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23D 51/10 (2006.01); B23D 61/12 (2006.01); B27B 19/00 (2006.01); B28D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23D 61/123 (2013.01); A61B 17/142 (2016.11); B23D 49/11 (2013.01); B23D 51/10 (2013.01); B23D 61/006 (2013.01); B23D 61/12 (2013.01); B24B 23/04 (2013.01); B27B 19/006 (2013.01); B28D 1/127 (2013.01); A61B 17/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881023 A2 19981202; EP 0881023 A3 20000823; EP 0881023 B1 20051109; EP 0881023 B8 20060111; AT 309067 T 20051115; DE 59813169 D1 20051215; DK 0881023 T3 20060220; EP 1625909 A1 20060215; EP 1625909 B1 20160427

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160510

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160509

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-08-04 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20100624

2010-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GRUPE, HORST

- Effective date: 20060809

2010-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: WSENGINEERING GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20100525

2006-09-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GRUPE, HORST

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-14 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER (B DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: MAROC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP4

2006-06-14 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER (B DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: C. & E. FEIN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP4

2006-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-02-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-02-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAROC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: C. & E. FEIN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813169

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI SE

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEIGER, MARCO

2005-11-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUTER, DAVID

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAROC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEIGER, MARCO

2005-07-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUTER, DAVID

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031002

2001-05-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI SE

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YLINIA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YLINIA AG

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FI FR IT LI SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI