Global Patent Index - EP 0881094 B1

EP 0881094 B1 2000-10-18 - A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (en)

A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckplatten damit

Title (fr)

Elément d'enregistrement thermosensible et procédé pour la fabrication de plaques lithographiques utilisant cet élément

Publication

EP 0881094 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97201559 A

Priority

EP 97201559 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881094A1] According to the present invention there is provided a heat-sensitive imaging element for making lithographic printing plates comprising a lithographic base having a hydrophilic surface, a hydrophobic first layer that is sensitive to heat including at least a hydrophobic polymer and a compound that is capable of converting light into heat, said layer having a decreased or increased capacity for being penetrated and/or solubilised by an aqueous developer upon exposure to actinic light, characterized in that said imaging element comprises a second layer located between the first layer and the hydrophilic surface and including a dispersed hydrophobic thermoplastic polymer latex, said second layer being soluble or dispersible in an aqueous solution.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/36; B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/36 (2006.01); B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/46 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/36 (2013.01); B41C 1/1025 (2013.01); B41C 1/1008 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881094 A1 19981202; EP 0881094 B1 20001018; DE 69703344 D1 20001123; DE 69703344 T2 20010426; JP H10329440 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090527

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703344 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990907

1999-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990907

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990602

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB