Global Patent Index - EP 0881149 B1

EP 0881149 B1 2000-03-22 - Machine for hooping objects comprising a tensioning device operating as a function of the height of the objects

Title (en)

Machine for hooping objects comprising a tensioning device operating as a function of the height of the objects

Title (de)

Maschine zum Umreifen von Objekten mit einer objekthöhenabhängigen arbeitenden Rückspanneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine de liage d'objets avec un dispositif de tensionnement opérant en fonction de la hauteur des objets

Publication

EP 0881149 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108211 A

Priority

DE 19722066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881149A1] The tape-guide frame (6) on the work-bench (3) guides the strap (7) round the object (4) such as packet or stack of products positioned on the work-bench inside the tape-guide frame. The strap is inserted into, and retrieved from, the tape-guide frame by an appliance (11) which places the strap loosely round the object which is then gripped tightly when the strap is tightened by a tightening appliance (10). A sensor (19) detects the height (H) of the object and is connected to a control. A storage facility stores at least one parameter relating to the tension in relation to height.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881149 A1 19981202; EP 0881149 B1 20000322; DE 19722066 A1 19981203; US 6003438 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800104

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140506

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-07-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20021224

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ATS AUTOMATIC TAPING SYSTEMS AG

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800104 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MACHINE FOR HOOPING OBJECTS COMPRISING A TENSIONING DEVICE OPERATING AS A FUNCTION OF THE HEIGHT OF THE OBJECTS

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981031

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI