Global Patent Index - EP 0881151 B1

EP 0881151 B1 2003-06-11 - Folding box

Title (en)

Folding box

Title (de)

Faltschachtel

Title (fr)

Boîte pliante

Publication

EP 0881151 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97117122 A

Priority

DE 29709510 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881151A1] A folding box (10) for storing, transporting and presenting goods, comprises a primary convex wall section (12). A secondary convex wall section (14) is arched in the opposite direction to the primary section, and a lid (30) and base (40) are also included. The primary and secondary sections are connected by a fold line (20). A primary outer wall section (16) is connected by a second fold line (22). A third fold line (23) is arranged parallel to the first and connects a secondary outer wall section (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29709510 U1 19970724; DE 59710267 D1 20030717; EP 0881151 A1 19981202; EP 0881151 B1 20030611; ES 2201236 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CARTONDRUCK A.G. *CD

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201236 T3

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710267 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CD CARTONDRUCK AG

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI