Global patent index - EP 0881153 B1

EP 0881153 B1 2000-08-02 - System-locking,hexagonal carton with handle

Title (en)

System-locking,hexagonal carton with handle

Title (de)

Selbstverriegelbare, hexagonale Faltschachtel mit Handgriff

Title (fr)

Emballage de forme hexagonale

Publication

EP 0881153 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97870073 A

Priority

EP 97870073 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881153A1] The box is made from a cardboard panel, cut out and folded to the required shape. It has upper and lower fold lines with a series of near vertical fold lines (3 - 8) between them forming the sides of the box, a number of flaps (9 - 12) below the lower fold line making the hexagonal base, and flaps (15') above the upper fold line which make two carrying handles. Above the upper fold line and in between the flaps which form the handles the lateral edges (16') of the flaps meet at a point (18) lying in line with an extension of one of the vertical fold lines (5). The point (18), and a similar one on the opposite side of the box when made up, is connected to the adjacent vertical fold lines by two short additional fold lines (19, 20) which slope from the point to the upper horizontal fold line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/46 (2006.01); B65D 5/462 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/029 (2013.01); B65D 5/008 (2013.01); B65D 5/46096 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881153 A1 19981202; EP 0881153 B1 20000802; DE 69702703 D1 20000907

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAN GENECHTEN BIERMANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010526

2001-01-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000802

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702703

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2000-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971218

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI