Global Patent Index - EP 0881165 B1

EP 0881165 B1 2002-09-04 - Packaging container for extemporaneously mixing two products

Title (en)

Packaging container for extemporaneously mixing two products

Title (de)

Verpackung zum Vermischen von zwei Produkten unmittelbar vor Gebrauch

Title (fr)

Conditionnement pour le mélange extemporané de deux produits

Publication

EP 0881165 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400921 A

Priority

FR 9705588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10310179A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a container comprising two bottles wherein sealing between the bottles can be easily and efficiently performed when products in respective bottles are to be mixed with each other. SOLUTION: The container for mixing two products as necessary is equipped with two bottles which are separated by a connecting means 8 to support a removable plug. The connecting means 8 comprises two separate parts, i.e., a first part 80 and a second part 82. The first part 80 supports the plug 10, and also, supports the top part 88 of a central hollow shaft which is turned into the base bottom of the first bottle under a liquid-tight state. The second part 82 is fitted in the first part 80, and also, forms the bottom part of the central hollow shaft, and also, supports a means 29 to push out the plug for the purpose of the performing of a mixing. A means which prevents the second part 82 from rotating regarding the first part 80 is provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/08 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3211 (2013.01); Y10S 215/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763048 A1 19981113; FR 2763048 B1 19990709; AR 011725 A1 20000830; CA 2235081 A1 19981106; CA 2235081 C 20020813; DE 69807577 D1 20021010; DE 69807577 T2 20030109; EP 0881165 A1 19981202; EP 0881165 B1 20020904; ES 2183297 T3 20030316; JP 2948201 B2 19990913; JP H10310179 A 19981124; US 5908107 A 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030415

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183297 T3

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807577 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990602

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI