Global Patent Index - EP 0881168 A3

EP 0881168 A3 2000-01-12 - Transporting device for apparatus containing polluting liquids

Title (en)

Transporting device for apparatus containing polluting liquids

Title (de)

Mobile Tragevorrichtung für Geräte mit umweltschädlichen Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif transportable pour appareils contenant des liquides polluants

Publication

EP 0881168 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107499 A

Priority

DE 19722621 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881168A2] The carrying arrangement (1) is for a heavy piece of machinery (6). It is used for handling a machine which stands on the floor and contains a liquid in a container, which could be environmentally damaging if it leaked. The carrier comprises a bath (2) with sidewalls (4) and locating members. One of the sidewalls has a catchment surface (7). The sidewall with the catchment surface preferably has a polyethylene container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881168 A2 19981202; EP 0881168 A3 20000112; DE 19722621 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-01-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR LI LU NL

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI