Global Patent Index - EP 0881348 B1

EP 0881348 B1 2002-12-11 - A hinge junction device, in particular for wardrobe and cabinet doors

Title (en)

A hinge junction device, in particular for wardrobe and cabinet doors

Title (de)

Gelenkbeschlag, insbesondere für Schrank- und Möbeltüren

Title (fr)

Fixation de charnière, en particulier pour porte de placard et de meuble

Publication

EP 0881348 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98109331 A

Priority

IT MI971235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881348A1] A hinge junction device is provided, in particular for wardrobe and cabinet doors, comprising at least two rocking rods (2, 3) and two attachment sets (6, 7) to be connected to a door (4) and a post (5), respectively. Each attachment set (6, 7) is provided with a support body (10, 11), an engagement portion (8, 9) interposed between the support body and hinging ends of the rocking rods, and connecting and adjusting means (12) interposed between the support bodies (10, 11) and the corresponding engagement portions (8, 9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04; E05D 5/08; E05D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/14 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 5/08 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05D 5/08 (2013.01); E05D 7/125 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881348 A1 19981202; EP 0881348 B1 20021211; AT 229607 T 20021215; DE 69810007 D1 20030123; DE 69810007 T2 20030925; ES 2189035 T3 20030701; IT 1292005 B1 19990125; IT MI971235 A1 19981127; IT MI971235 D0 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070522

2006-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189035 T3

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810007 20030123

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229607 T 20021215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990531

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI