Global Patent Index - EP 0881349 A3

EP 0881349 A3 2000-12-27 - Vertical roller door

Title (en)

Vertical roller door

Title (de)

Deckengliedertor

Title (fr)

Porte roulante verticale

Publication

EP 0881349 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98202207 A

Priority

IT MI970390 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881349A2] An improved rolling gate (1), is provided with a DC electric motor (25) at a very low voltage, said motor is powered by an accumulator battery (21) associated to a battery charger (20) which can be connected to the 220 V power grid. In this way the gate (1) can be driven independently of the presence of the power grid voltage and the electric system (9) is more economical since it does not require the expensive protective means needed for the corresponding electric systems which work with 380 V current. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/02; E05F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/08 (2006.01); E05F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/59 (2013.01); E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05F 15/72 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/512 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/612 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/822 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881349 A2 19981202; EP 0881349 A3 20001227; IT 237536 Y1 20000913; IT MI970390 U1 19981130; IT MI970390 V0 19970530

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05F 15/02 A, 7E 05F 15/08 B

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI