Global Patent Index - EP 0881364 B1

EP 0881364 B1 2002-11-13 - Manufacture of a variable phase device comprising a rotor and a vane, particularly for internal combustion engines camshafts

Title (en)

Manufacture of a variable phase device comprising a rotor and a vane, particularly for internal combustion engines camshafts

Title (de)

Herstellung einer aus einem Flügelrad und einem Zellenrad gebildeten Drehwinkel-Verstelleinheit, insbesondere für Nockenwellen von Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Fabrication d'un variateur de phase comprenant un rotor et une palette, en particulier pour arbres à cames de moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0881364 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107358 A

Priority

DE 19722133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881364A1] The adjuster which comprises a flywheel and cell wheel has a first unit (1) with first adjustment area and second unit (2) with second adjustment area. A third adjuster unit can be made from the flywheel wheel (4) of one unit and the cell wheel (5) of the other. With the cell wheel the start or end of the corresponding adjustment area (V2,V1) is selected identical with the displacement start (VB1) or displacement end of the adjustment area of the adjuster unit. The flywheel is locked with the cell wheel at the start or at the end of adjustment. The third adjuster unit can be made from the flywheel of the first adjuster unit provided for an inlet camshaft of an internal combustion engine with an adjustment area of about 40 degrees turning angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881364 A1 19981202; EP 0881364 B1 20021113; DE 19722133 A1 19981203; ES 2185079 T3 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160422

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160422

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806241

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185079 T3

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806241 20021219

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

1999-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990415

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI