Global Patent Index - EP 0881376 A3

EP 0881376 A3 2000-03-22 - Electronic vibration damping apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Electronic vibration damping apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Elektronische Ruckeldämpfungseinrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif électronique d'ammortissement de secousses pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0881376 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107392 A

Priority

DE 19722253 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881376A2] The road vehicle has a fuel-injected engine. The accelerator pedal (11) is used to provide a command (Mew) for fuel input and this is transmitted to the injection control unit via a filter (12). The actual vehicle speed (N) is fed back through a filter (14) as a fuel value that is compared with the filtered demand value (Med). This provides a damping action to give a smooth action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 41/0225 (2013.01); F02D 41/045 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 2200/501 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01); F02D 2250/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0768455 A2 19970416 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [X] WO 8907709 A1 19890824 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [A] DE 3343854 A1 19850613 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [A] HEISS M: "KENNFELDER IN DER REGELUNGSTECHNIK INPUT-OUTPUT MAPS FOR AUTOMATIC CONTROL", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK - AT,DE,OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 43, no. 8, 1 August 1995 (1995-08-01), pages 363 - 367, XP000523262, ISSN: 0178-2312

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722253 A1 19981105; EP 0881376 A2 19981202; EP 0881376 A3 20000322; US 6098593 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021127

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI