Global patent index - EP 0881410 A4

EP 0881410 A4 2001-03-21 - NON-STAGE TRANSMISSION FOR VEHICLES AND LAWN MOWING TRACTOR USING SAME

Title (en)

NON-STAGE TRANSMISSION FOR VEHICLES AND LAWN MOWING TRACTOR USING SAME

Title (de)

STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE FÜR FAHRZEUGE UND RASENMÄHER MIT EINEM SOLCHEN GETRIEBE

Title (fr)

TRANSMISSION NON ETAGEE POUR VEHICULES ET TRACTEUR DE TONTE DE PELOUSE L'UTILISANT

Publication

EP 0881410 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97912530 A

Priority

  • JP 9704244 W
  • JP 32738296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881410A1] A non-stage transmission T for vehicles comprises two power transmission paths leading to a planet gear mechanism (12), one of which paths is constituted by a belt speed change mechanism (9). The other of the power transmission paths is constituted by a belt transmission mechanism (6) in order to limit the number of casings, improve a quality of maintenance for each of the belt speed change mechanism (9) and the transmission mechanism, which constituted the other of the power transmission paths, and to promote mounting of the non-stage transmission T on a vehicle. Further, arranged on an upper side of a casing (2) of the planet gear mechanism (12) are both speed change pulleys (10, 10) of the belt speed change mechanism (9) and a speed change belt (11), and arranged on a lower side of the casing (2) are both transmission pulleys (7), 7) of the belt transmission mechanism (6) and a transmission belt (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 37/02; F16H 7/02; F16H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/64 (2006.01); B62D 49/00 (2006.01); F16H 37/02 (2006.01); F16H 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 57/035 (2013.01); F16H 37/0846 (2013.01); F16H 57/037 (2013.01); F16H 2037/088 (2013.01); F16H 2057/02056 (2013.01); F16H 2057/02095 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881410 A1 19981202; EP 0881410 A4 20010321; EP 0881410 B1 20040204; DE 69727469 D1 20040311; DE 69727469 T2 20040722; JP 3217285 B2 20011009; JP H10169749 A 19980626; US 6142898 A 20001107; WO 9825052 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051120

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051120

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69727469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980825

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB