Global Patent Index - EP 0881459 B1

EP 0881459 B1 2002-11-27 - Training projectile

Title (en)

Training projectile

Title (de)

Übungsgeschoss

Title (fr)

Projectile d'exercise

Publication

EP 0881459 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105926 A

Priority

DE 19722698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881459A2] A practice shell (1) contains a central tube (7) extending over most of the shell length, the tube being enclosed by inert material (5) and containing two or more spaced-apart explosive charges (8-11), preferably of TNT or 'Comp B', connected by transmission charges (12), preferably of a hexogen- or octogen-containing explosive. Preferably, the explosive charge (11), adjacent the nose impact fuse of the shell, consists of a hexogen- or octogen-containing explosive and a tracer charge (15) of pyrotechnic material or incendiary carbon black is located within the plastic or metal tube (7) between the shell base (14) and the adjacent explosive charge (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/14; F42B 12/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722698 C1 19981105; EP 0881459 A2 19981202; EP 0881459 A3 19990901; EP 0881459 B1 20021127; ES 2185075 T3 20030416; NO 309294 B1 20010108; NO 981486 A 19981201; NO 981486 D0 19980402; US 6041713 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806398

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110402

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110402

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH

- Free text: RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH#HEINRICH-EHRHARDT-STRASSE 2#29345 UNTERLUESS (DE) -TRANSFER TO- RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH#HEINRICH-EHRHARDT-STRASSE 2#29345 UNTERLUESS (DE)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-06 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185075 T3

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806398 20030109

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2000-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990730

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI