Global Patent Index - EP 0881720 B1

EP 0881720 B1 2002-09-18 - Apparatus for assembling grommet to lead

Title (en)

Apparatus for assembling grommet to lead

Title (de)

Gerät zum Anbringen eines Leitungsdurchführungspfropfens

Title (fr)

Appareil pour l'assemblage de traversées pour conducteurs électriques

Publication

EP 0881720 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98109293 A

Priority

  • EP 98109293 A
  • EP 97401208 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881720A2] A grommet assembly apparatus comprises a grommet mounting device (32) having an expansion sleeve (68) for receiving grommets (14) thereon. Grommets (14) are transferred from a grommet feed channel (44) onto the expansion sleeve (68) by a movable transfer pin (56) having a pointed tip (58) that inserts into the expansion sleeve cavity (70). Compressed air is provided in the expansion sleeve cavity (70) to prevent the grommet pinching between the cavity and pin, thereby ensuring a smooth insertion of the grommet over the expansion sleeve (68). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881720 A2 19981202; EP 0881720 A3 19990721; EP 0881720 B1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170522

2018-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171201

2018-03-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180131

2018-01-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69807982

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG, LI

2017-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807982

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-03-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG, CH

- Effective date: 20120214

2012-03-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOMAX HOLDING AG, DIERIKON, CH

- Document: DE 69807982

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-03-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69807982

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG, LI

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-02-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69807982

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG, LI

2011-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROSENICH PAUL; GISLER CHRISTIAN PATENTBUERO PAUL R

2011-12-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG

- Free text: KOMAX HOLDING AG#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 6#6036 DIERIKON (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SCHLEUNIGER HOLDING AG#BIERIGUTSTRASSE 9#3608 THUN (CH)

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090522

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090522

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: INVENTIO AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807982 20021024

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMAX HOLDING AG

2000-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI PT

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI