Global Patent Index - EP 0881865 A3

EP 0881865 A3 2000-06-28 - Device for producing a plurality of low temperature plasma jets

Title (en)

Device for producing a plurality of low temperature plasma jets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Vielzahl von Niedertemperatur-Plasmajets

Title (fr)

Dispositif de production d'une pluralité de jets de plasma basse température

Publication

EP 0881865 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98109597 A

Priority

DE 19722624 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0881865A2] The appliance has at least one hollow cathode chamber (32) surrounded by a hollow cathode (12) and a high frequency power supply. The cathode has at least one inlet (15) for the gas used and an anode adjacent to one of the cathodes. Cathode and anode have holes (6,7) which face one another and through which the plasma jets (5) pass from the hollow cathode chamber into a process cell. The appliance has several separate individual hollow cathode chambers and each allocated to a plasma jet. The hollow cathode chamber can be divided into a number of separate individual chambers to form individual cathodes each with its own gas inlet

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0881865 A2 19981202; EP 0881865 A3 20000628; EP 0881865 B1 20020918; DE 19722624 A1 19981203; DE 19722624 C2 20010809

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20110914

2011-10-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20110914

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2011-09-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59805573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2011-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: REINHAUSEN PLASMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1998-12-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI