Global Patent Index - EP 0882117 B1

EP 0882117 B1 2002-11-13 - SOIL-REPELLENT AGENT AND METHOD FOR TREATING ARTICLES BASED ON WOVEN COTTON

Title (en)

SOIL-REPELLENT AGENT AND METHOD FOR TREATING ARTICLES BASED ON WOVEN COTTON

Title (de)

SCHMUTZABWEISENDES MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBTEN BAUMWOLLARTIKELN

Title (fr)

AGENT ANTISALISSURE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES ARTICLES A BASE DE COTON TISSE

Publication

EP 0882117 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97906221 A

Priority

  • FR 9700304 W
  • FR 9602181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9731085A1] A soil-repellent treatment method for articles based on woven cotton, wherein an amphiphilic soil-repellent agent soluble or dispersible in the treatment medium is deposited on the article during one or more washing, rinsing and/or softening or drying steps, is disclosed. Said soil-repellent agent comprises at least one unit with a function (FAd) capable of being adsorbed onto the surface of the cotton by electrostatic interaction; and at least one hydrophobic unit (MH) capable of configuring said agent at the cotton/water interface. Said unit (MH) may itself be one of the components of the unit having said function (FAd) or may be chemically bonded thereto via a hydrophilic chain. Said soil-repellent agent is added during the washing step by means of a washing composition, during the rinsing and/or softening step by means of a rinsing and/or softening composition, and during the drying step by means of an absorbent carrier. A soil-repellent agent comprising at least one unit with a cationic function (MC) capable of being adsorbed onto the surface of the cotton, and the counter-ion thereof, as well as at least one hydrophobic unit (MH) containing at least four carbon atoms chemically bonded to the unit having said cationic function (MC) via an oligomeric, polymeric or copolymeric vinyl alcohol chain, is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/62; C11D 1/60; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/60 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3753 (2013.01); C11D 1/60 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/3715 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9731085 A1 19970828; AT 227765 T 20021115; AU 2098397 A 19970910; BR 9707650 A 19990727; CA 2246381 A1 19970828; DE 69717079 D1 20021219; DE 69717079 T2 20030724; EP 0882117 A1 19981209; EP 0882117 B1 20021113; ES 2187757 T3 20030616; FR 2745014 A1 19970822; FR 2745014 B1 19980403; JP 3253972 B2 20020204; JP H11505568 A 19990521; US 6379394 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050228

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2005-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0882117E

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187757 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717079 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227765 T 20021115

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010509

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980720

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE