Global Patent Index - EP 0882126 B1

EP 0882126 B1 2000-04-19 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DETERGENTE

Publication

EP 0882126 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97901008 A

Priority

  • EP 9700118 W
  • GB 9601920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728246A1] A process for the production of a low to medium bulk density detergent composition by mixing a liquid binder and a particulate starting material in a high speed mixer/granulator to form granules which are then contacted with a particulate material having a bulk density of not more than 700g/l in very low shear mixing zone for example a fluid bed. Compositions produced by this process are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 11/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728246 A1 19970807; AR 005576 A1 19990623; AU 1440997 A 19970822; BR 9707474 A 19990727; CA 2242420 A1 19970807; CA 2242420 C 20050830; CN 1191351 C 20050302; CN 1209835 A 19990303; DE 69701731 D1 20000525; DE 69701731 T2 20000810; EA 001314 B1 20010226; EP 0882126 A1 19981209; EP 0882126 B1 20000419; ES 2145567 T3 20000701; GB 9601920 D0 19960403; HU 9901180 A2 19990830; HU 9901180 A3 20020429; IN 188387 B 20020914; PL 184656 B1 20021129; PL 328022 A1 19990104; TR 9801444 T2 19981021; ZA 9700255 B 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-04-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060922

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010108

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010119

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-21 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA * 20010119 THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPAN

- Effective date: 20010108

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20010119

2001-02-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145567 T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701731 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980630

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT