Global patent index - EP 0882162 B1

EP 0882162 B1 2000-11-15 - COMPOSITE-STRUCTURE BUILDING FRAMEWORK

Title (en)

COMPOSITE-STRUCTURE BUILDING FRAMEWORK

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENGESTELLTE GEBÄUDETRAGKONSTRUKTION

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE COMPOSITE POUR OSSATURE DE BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0882162 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97903411 A

Priority

  • FI 9700109 W
  • FI 960759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9730235A1] A composite-structure building framework, which comprises horizontal steel girders (21) and vertical steel columns (12), which have been joined together with bolts (14). The vertical column (12a) has been placed from above against the bottom (22) or side flanges (27a) of the horizontal girder and fastened to the lower column (12b) at the corresponding point with bolts (14) going through the bottom (22) or the side flanges of the horizontal girder. Concrete reinforcements (19) are, if necessary, placed both in the U-shaped trough or box formed by the horizontal girder and inside the columns, and these spaces are filled with concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/30 (2006.01); E04B 1/16 (2006.01); E04C 3/07 (2006.01); E04C 3/293 (2006.01); E04C 3/34 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/065 (2013.01); E04B 1/165 (2013.01); E04C 3/07 (2013.01); E04C 3/293 (2013.01); E04C 3/34 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0413 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0417 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0434 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0465 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0473 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9730235 A1 19970821; AT 197617 T 20001215; AU 1797697 A 19970902; DE 69703534 D1 20001221; DE 69703534 T2 20010628; EP 0882162 A1 19981209; EP 0882162 B1 20001115; FI 105121 B 20000615; FI 960759 A0 19960219; FI 960759 A 19970820; RU 2178042 C2 20020110

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-09-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703534

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-21

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197617

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990629

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980921

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE