Global Patent Index - EP 0882415 B1

EP 0882415 B1 2002-09-04 - Legs adjustable in height for supporting a table top, desk top or work top.

Title (en)

Legs adjustable in height for supporting a table top, desk top or work top.

Title (de)

Höheneinstellbare Füsse zum Tragen einer Tisch-, Büro- oder Arbeitsplatte

Title (fr)

Pieds ajustables en hauteur pour supporter un dessus de table, de bureau ou un plan de travail

Publication

EP 0882415 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98201827 A

Priority

NL 1006222 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882415A1] Legs (1) adjustable in height for supporting a table top, desk top or work top (9), each leg (1) being provided with an assembly of screw shaft (12) and nut (11), situated in hollow columns (5, 7) slidable relative to each other in such a way, that on rotation of the screw shaft (12) the columns are moved relative to each other. An electric motor (14) driving the screw shaft (12) through the transmission is incorporated in the column (7). The motors (14) of the legs (1) are electronically coupled and there are electronic means (15) for counting the number of rotations performed by each of the screw shafts (12) and for mutually comparing the numbers of rotations. The electronic means provide for adjustment of the speeds of the motors (14) in such a way that the number of rotations of each of the screw shafts (12) is substantially equal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/04; A47B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/04 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0058 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882415 A1 19981209; EP 0882415 B1 20020904; DE 69807581 D1 20021010; DE 69807581 T2 20030522; NL 1006222 C2 19981207

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130602

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807581

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130602

2014-01-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE *AHREND N.V.

- Effective date: 20130630

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807581 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990420

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI