Global Patent Index - EP 0882423 A3

EP 0882423 A3 2000-05-31 - DISPENSING DEVICE FOR DISHWASHER

Title (en)

DISPENSING DEVICE FOR DISHWASHER

Title (de)

ZUGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR GESCHIRRSPÜLER

Title (fr)

Dispositif distributeur de produits pour lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 0882423 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98400745 A

Priority

FR 9703840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761254A1] The product recipients and distributors (7) which take the form of a jug with a lip (8) are fixed to the inside of the front face of the upper basket (5). High pressure water is supplied to the recipient (7) through a horizontal conduit (14). The horizontal conduit (14) is connected to the supply side (12) of the mill (6) and the high pressure water is fed to the recipient (7) through a U shaped passage (10) astride one wall (9). The product within the recipient distributor (7) is dispersed by the high speed and direction of the water and is aided by the lip (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4409 (2013.01); A47L 15/4445 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761254 A1 19981002; FR 2761254 B1 19990611; DE 69839595 D1 20080724; EP 0882423 A2 19981209; EP 0882423 A3 20000531; EP 0882423 B1 20080611; ES 2310003 T3 20081216

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170427

2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-03-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-11 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Effective date: 20160307

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120330

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69839595

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090312

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080911

2008-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2310003 T3

2008-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69839595 P 20080724

2008-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

2007-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISHWASHER

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070412

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI