Global patent index - EP 0882470 A3

EP 0882470 A3 2000-04-12 - Fire extinguishing plant

Title (en)

Fire extinguishing plant

Title (de)

Feuerlöschanlage

Title (fr)

Installation d'extinction d'incendie

Publication

EP 0882470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98108699 A

Priority

DE 19723556 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882470A2] The gas flasks (6) which are filled with high pressure extinguishing gas have in the neck area (19) a fastener (8) which are hung by an electronic weighing device (13) with direct connection to the central fire alarm unit on at least one collecting tube (2) which is supported on supports (4,5). The flask valves are connected to the collecting tube which leads from the flask valves to the extinguishing valves by hoses. The fastener comprises a lower ring plate screwed onto the flask neck (19) and an upper plate. The plates are connected together at a distance by two or more screw bolts with the weighing device connected to the plate on one side and to the collecting tube (2) on the other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 37/50; G01G 17/04; G01G 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882470 A2 19981209; EP 0882470 A3 20000412; DE 19723556 A1 19981210; DE 19723556 B4 20040708; NO 315499 B1 20030915; NO 982548 A 19981207; NO 982548 D0 19980604

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050719

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040112

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 62C 37/50 A, 7G 01G 17/04 B, 7G 01G 19/18 B

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI