Global Patent Index - EP 0882527 A3

EP 0882527 A3 2001-03-21 - Method and installation to transfer a wire coil from the coiling station of a cooling line to a conveyor hook

Title (en)

Method and installation to transfer a wire coil from the coiling station of a cooling line to a conveyor hook

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Übergabe eines Drahtbundes von der Bundbildestation eines Kühltransportes auf einen C-Haken einer Hakenbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de transfert d'une bobine de fil du dispositif de bobinage d'une ligne de refroidissement à un crochet de transport

Publication

EP 0882527 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107000 A

Priority

DE 19717769 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882527A2] The coil (30) is transferred from the chamber (3) on a forming station (2) of a cooling conveyor (1) onto a C-shaped hook (16) travelling along a rail track. It is delivered directly onto the hook (16a) as this is swung into the vertical position. After a section of the track in the formation station has been opened up, the hook can be taken over by a grab, which swing it from the horizontal travelling position into the vertical one, in which the coil is dropped onto it. It is then lowered and swung back into the horizontal position and the track section closed to transport it away. The operation is then repeated with the next hook.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/61 (2006.01); B21B 43/10 (2006.01); B21C 47/24 (2006.01); B66C 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/24 (2013.01); B21C 47/24 (2013.01); B21C 47/242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717769 A1 19981029; EP 0882527 A2 19981209; EP 0882527 A3 20010321; JP H1133625 A 19990209; US 6024316 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030808

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT SE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980417

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI