Global Patent Index - EP 0882534 B1

EP 0882534 B1 2002-11-06 - Apparatus and use of the apparatus for producing a cylinder block of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Apparatus and use of the apparatus for producing a cylinder block of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und deren Verwendung zum Herstellen eines Zylinderblockes einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et son usage pour la fabrication d'un bloc-cylindres d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0882534 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98109853 A

Priority

  • JP 14399697 A
  • JP 12991098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882534A1] A production method for a cylinder block of an internal combustion engine includes a first step and a second step. At the first step, a preform (2) having an inside surface (2a) and an outside surface (2b) is set to a bore core (1) so that a clearance (8) is formed between the inside surface (2a) of the preform and an outside surface (1a) of the bore core (1). At the second step, a molten metal (5) is supplied into a cavity (4) so that the molten metal (5) infiltrates into the preform (2) from both the inside surface (2a) and the outside surface (2b) of the preform (2) thereby changing to a metal matrix composite, which constitutes an inside surface of a cast cylinder block. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/24 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 19/08 (2006.01); B22D 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/0009 (2013.01); B22D 19/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882534 A1 19981209; EP 0882534 B1 20021106; DE 69809126 D1 20021212; DE 69809126 T2 20030508; JP H1147913 A 19990223

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2005-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809126 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND USE OF THE APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING A CYLINDER BLOCK OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000224

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980529

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI