Global Patent Index - EP 0882601 B1

EP 0882601 B1 2001-02-28 - Thermal transfer recording medium with wax release layer

Title (en)

Thermal transfer recording medium with wax release layer

Title (de)

Thermische Übertragungsaufzeichnungsmaterial mit einer Abziehschicht aus Wachs

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement pour le transfert par la chaleur avec une couche de décollage contenant une cire

Publication

EP 0882601 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98110033 A

Priority

JP 14557497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0882601A1] A thermal transfer recording medium for forming a color image by superimposingly transferring plural different color inks, comprising a foundation and a color ink layer provided on the foundation, and a release layer comprising a wax interposed between the foundation and the color ink layer, wherein the thickness d1 of the release layer for a first color and the thickness d2 of the release layer for a second color satisfy the relationship represented by formula ( I ): <MATH> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/34; B41M 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/382 (2006.01); B41M 5/34 (2006.01); B41M 5/392 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/41 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/423 (2013.01); B41M 5/345 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0882601 A1 19981209; EP 0882601 B1 20010228; DE 69800540 D1 20010405; DE 69800540 T2 20010809; JP H10329435 A 19981215

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090602

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800540 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-09-08 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19990602

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990609

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI